House
|
05/19/2013
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2013
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3910
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2013
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 2156
|
House
|
05/01/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2156
|
House
|
04/18/2013
|
Received from the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1678
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1119
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 997
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 996
|
Senate
|
04/18/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1071
|
Senate
|
04/17/2013
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2013
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 942
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2013
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 658
|
Senate
|
03/25/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 607
|
Senate
|
03/18/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 516
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 417
|
Senate
|
03/12/2013
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 417
|
Senate
|
03/06/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 384
|
Senate
|
03/05/2013
|
Co-author authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 366
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2013
|
Received by the Secretary of the Senate
|
|
|