E | 05/10/2013 | Effective on 9/1/13 | ||
E | 05/10/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 1765 | |
E | 05/01/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 1371 | |
House | 05/01/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 2157 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1329 | |
Senate | 04/30/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 1371 | |
Senate | 04/29/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 1272 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Record vote | RV#303 | Journal Page: 1858 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 1858 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1858 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1844 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1844 | |
House | 04/25/2013 | Laid out in lieu of companion | HB 2238 | Journal Page: 1844 |
House | 04/25/2013 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/24/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1913 | |
House | 04/23/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/23/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/11/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1511 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 884 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 794 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 794 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 794 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 794 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 794 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 794 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 794 | |
Senate | 04/10/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Not again placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 658 | |
Senate | 03/26/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/21/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 569 | |
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/20/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Higher Education | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 419 | |
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/28/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |