E | 06/14/2013 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/14/2013 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 3869 | |
E | 05/26/2013 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 3834 | |
House | 05/26/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5381 | |
Senate | 05/25/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3515 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3068 | |
Senate | 05/22/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 2808 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 4185 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Record vote | RV#1070 | Journal Page: 4184 |
House | 05/22/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 4184 | |
House | 05/22/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 4184 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 4029 | |
House | 05/21/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 4029 | |
House | 05/20/2013 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/17/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/17/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2013 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/15/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1559 | |
House | 04/04/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 1426 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 754 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed | Journal Page: 728 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 728 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 728 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 728 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 727 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 Birdwell | Journal Page: 726 |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 726 | |
Senate | 04/04/2013 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 726 | |
Senate | 04/03/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/27/2013 | Reported favorably as substituted | Journal Page: 660 | |
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 03/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 420 | |
Senate | 03/11/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 396 | |
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 03/01/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |