E | 02/13/2013 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 218 | |
House | 02/13/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 346 | |
Senate | 02/12/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 194 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 196 | |
Senate | 02/11/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 182 | |
House | 02/07/2013 | Record vote | RV#33 | Journal Page: 281 |
House | 02/07/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 281 | |
House | 02/07/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 280 | |
House | 02/07/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 289 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 178 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 178 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 178 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 178 | |
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |