Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR11

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 6, 2013, and ending on Monday, February 11, 2013.

Impact

If adopted, SCR11 would direct state entities to prioritize sustainability initiatives and considerations in their operations and policies. This could lead to significant changes in how state-funded projects are planned and executed, encouraging practices that not only comply with existing regulations but also proactively enhance environmental quality. The resolution could also inspire alignment among state education programs to better prepare future generations for jobs in the green economy, potentially addressing both environmental and economic concerns simultaneously.

Summary

SCR11 is a concurrent resolution that emphasizes the importance of establishing a sustainable environmental policy framework for the state. It proposes several strategic objectives aimed at fostering environmental stewardship and promoting renewable energy sources. The resolution outlines the need for alignment between state agencies, educational institutions, and private sector partners to effectively address environmental challenges, including pollution and climate change. The document serves as a guiding principle rather than a binding law, intending to influence future legislative decisions regarding environmental matters.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR11 has been largely positive, with numerous stakeholders expressing support for its objectives. Environmental groups and some members of the legislature lauded the resolution as a critical step towards more robust climate action and preservation of the state's natural resources. However, some critique exists, particularly from those in the industrial sector, expressing concerns about potential increased regulations and costs that could arise from a heightened environmental focus.

Contention

While SCR11 seeks to create a framework for environmental policy, notable contention arises regarding the balance between ecological initiatives and economic impact. Stakeholders have raised questions about how the proposed sustainability strategies will affect existing industries, particularly those dependent on traditional energy sources. The resolution could become a focal point for broader debates on economic growth versus environmental responsibility, highlighting the challenges that state lawmakers will face in reconciling these interests.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.