E | 02/20/2013 | Filed with the Secretary of State | Journal Page: 266 | |
House | 02/20/2013 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 455 | |
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 239 | |
Senate | 02/18/2013 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 245 | |
Senate | 02/18/2013 | House passage reported | Journal Page: 233 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Record vote | RV#40 | Journal Page: 377 |
House | 02/18/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 377 | |
House | 02/18/2013 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 377 | |
House | 02/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 374 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Record vote | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Read | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 203 | |
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |