Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR14

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 13, 2013, and ending on Monday, February 18, 2013.

Impact

The resolution is significant as it provides a rare modification to the standard operation of the Texas Legislature, which typically mandates that neither house can adjourn for more than three days without mutual consent. By allowing for a longer break, SCR14 can impact the scheduling and flow of legislative business, especially if contentious issues or significant bills are being discussed. It supports legislative flexibility during a critical period, potentially allowing for more thorough debate and deliberation on pressing matters facing the state.

Summary

SCR14, also known as Senate Concurrent Resolution No. 14, proposes a temporary adjustment regarding legislative adjournment periods as established by the Texas Constitution. Specifically, the resolution seeks to grant permission for each house of the legislature to adjourn for more than three days during a defined period from February 13, 2013, to February 18, 2013. This measure aims to facilitate necessary legislative processes that may require extended periods of deliberation without the constraint of the usual three-day adjournment rule that typically governs legislative sessions in Texas.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR14 appears neutral to positive, as it reflects a procedural adjustment rather than a policy change. While there are no strong oppositions reported in the discussions, some legislators may view this resolution as an essential tool for improving legislative efficiency and ensuring that legislators have the time to consider complex issues adequately. However, there are inherent risks associated with longer adjournment periods, such as delays in passing critical legislation.

Contention

Any contention surrounding SCR14 would likely stem from opinions on the appropriate length of legislative breaks and whether such flexibility could lead to inefficiencies or delay necessary legislative actions. As the resolution does not propose a permanent change to the legislative rules but instead offers a temporary permission, debates may focus on how such measures could set precedents in the future, impacting how legislative sessions are managed. The considerations surrounding adjournment decisions find their roots in the broader context of legislative responsibilities and the competing demands of conducting government business effectively.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.