Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR19

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, February 27, 2013, and ending on Monday, March 4, 2013.

Impact

If enacted, SCR19 will have significant implications for existing state laws. It will amend several statutes to ensure that state regulations take precedence over local laws in areas where the state has established guidelines. This could potentially centralize authority within the state government while reducing the ability of local governments to tailor regulations to their specific context, particularly in areas such as environmental protection, labor laws, and public health standards.

Summary

SCR19 is a legislative proposal that aims to address the balance of regulatory authority between state and local governments. The bill seeks to limit the power of local jurisdictions to impose regulations that go beyond what is established at the state level. Proponents of SCR19 argue that by standardizing regulations, businesses will have a clearer framework in which to operate, ultimately leading to economic growth and consistency across the state's diverse localities.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR19 is sharply divided among legislators and stakeholders. Supporters, primarily from business sectors and certain political groups, argue that it will eliminate the confusion and complexity that arise from a multitude of local laws, fostering an environment conducive to business. Conversely, opponents include activists and community leaders who contend that the bill could undermine local governance, eroding the authority of communities to address their unique challenges and needs.

Contention

A central point of contention in the discussions about SCR19 revolves around the concept of local control versus state oversight. Critics argue that the bill represents an overreach that disregards the rights of local governments to self-determination, especially in contexts where local regulations respond to pressing community issues. The debate reflects broader themes in state politics, with implications for how the state interacts with its various municipalities and the authority vested in local government structures.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.