Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR29

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2013, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2013.

Impact

Should SCR29 be enacted, it could lead to significant reforms in how school funding is allocated within the state. Discussions underscore that the resolution could prompt legislative changes aimed at redistributing state resources to ensure that less affluent districts receive necessary financial support. This realignment of funding policies would aim to create a fairer environment for education, allowing all students, regardless of their geographic or socioeconomic status, to benefit from similar educational standards and opportunities.

Summary

SCR29 is a state resolution that emphasizes the need for equitable school funding across various districts. The resolution highlights disparities in funding that exist between wealthy and underfunded areas, advocating for solutions that ensure all students have access to quality educational resources and opportunities. Proponents of SCR29 argue that equitable funding is essential for fostering academic success and supporting the overall growth of communities, particularly those that are historically marginalized.

Sentiment

The sentiment surrounding SCR29 leans positively, particularly among educational advocates and community organizers who see it as a step toward addressing systemic inequities in school funding. While there is widespread agreement on the need for funding reforms, some legislators have voiced concerns about the feasibility of equitable funding measures and their potential impact on existing funding structures. This has led to a nuanced discussion on how best to achieve the goals outlined in the resolution while maintaining adequate funding for all districts.

Contention

Notable points of contention regarding SCR29 revolve around governance and the role of local versus state authority in determining educational standards and funding. Some legislators express apprehension that increased state intervention could undermine local control, with fears that one-size-fits-all solutions may not adequately address the unique challenges faced by individual districts. The resolution's advocates counter that local disparities necessitate a coordinated state approach to ensure that all students have access to equal educational opportunities.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR8

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 13, 2019, and ending on Monday, March 18, 2019.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.