Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SCR32

Caption

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 27, 2013, and ending on Tuesday, April 2, 2013.

Impact

The passage of SCR32 has direct implications for the legislative process in Texas, allowing for a temporary extension of the legislative session's break period. It shows the legislature's intent to maintain an adaptable approach when necessary, ensuring all members have the opportunity to participate in ongoing debates and discussions. By permitting this adjournment, the bill aids in facilitating the work of the legislature, as members can use this time for constituents or other legislative duties without the constraints of a stringent session agenda.

Summary

SCR32 is a Senate Concurrent Resolution introduced in the 83rd Legislature of Texas, which requests the consent of both houses to adjourn for more than three days during a specific period from March 27, 2013, to April 2, 2013. Under the Texas Constitution, neither house may adjourn for more than three days without mutual consent, and this resolution serves to formally allow the legislature to extend their break during this timeframe. The resolution reflects procedural flexibility within the legislative calendar, enabling both houses to manage their schedules effectively in light of required duties or external circumstances.

Sentiment

Overall, the sentiment surrounding SCR32 seems neutral, focusing on legislative efficiency rather than a contentious policy change. Since this resolution does not propose any substantive changes to law but rather addresses procedural matters, it is expected to garner support across party lines, as all members typically see the value in being able to manage their time effectively. Factors such as urgency in decision-making and addressing time-sensitive issues might also play a role in the favorable view of this resolution.

Contention

While SCR32 itself does not raise significant points of contention, it does reflect the larger context of legislative procedures and the importance of maintaining workflow flexibility. In times of pressing legislative needs or crises, extending adjournment periods can be crucial. However, discussions around such resolutions occasionally prompt reflections on the efficiency and design of the legislative calendar itself, highlighting the balance between necessary time off for lawmakers and the public's need for lawmaking to proceed unimpeded.

Companion Bills

No companion bills found.

Previously Filed As

TX HCR26

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 27, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 2, 2021.

TX HCR41

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 23, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 2, 2021.

TX HCR72

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 8, 2023, and ending on Monday, March 13, 2023.

TX HCR24

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, January 18, 2023, and ending on Tuesday, January 24, 2023.

TX HCR37

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Tuesday, February 9, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, February 16, 2021.

TX HCR49

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, March 3, 2021, and ending on Tuesday, March 9, 2021.

TX HCR45

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Thursday, January 22, 2015, and ending on Monday, January 26, 2015.

TX HCR9

Granting the legislature permission to adjourn for more than three days during the period beginning on Wednesday, April 17, 2019, and ending on Tuesday, April 23, 2019.

Similar Bills

No similar bills found.