House | 05/19/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/18/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/17/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3909 | |
House | 05/15/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 05/15/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/16/2013 | Referred to Federalism & Fiscal Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 1579 | |
House | 03/14/2013 | Received from the Senate | Journal Page: 751 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Adopted | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 471 | |
Senate | 03/13/2013 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/12/2013 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 03/05/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 366 | |
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 03/04/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 337 | |
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 02/25/2013 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 02/20/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 264 | |
Senate | 02/19/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 244 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Referred to Agriculture, Rural Affairs & Homeland Security | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 125 | |
Senate | 01/29/2013 | Co-author authorized | Journal Page: 127 | |
Senate | 01/17/2013 | Filed | ||
Senate | 01/17/2013 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |