Texas 2013 - 83rd Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR61 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Schwertner S.J.R. No. 61
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2013; March 18, 2013, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Finance; April 29, 2013,
 reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 3; April 29, 2013, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.J.R. No. 61 By:  Nelson


 SENATE JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment requiring the reduction of
 amounts paid by Texans to provide health care to the uninsured if
 Medicaid eligibility is expanded in accordance with the federal
 Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; requiring hospital
 district and county tax rate reductions.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 51-b to read as follows:
 Sec. 51-b.  If this state expands eligibility for medical
 assistance in accordance with and provides medical assistance using
 federal matching funds made available under the Patient Protection
 and Affordable Care Act (Pub. L. No. 111-148) as amended by the
 Health Care and Education Reconciliation Act of 2010 (Pub. L. No.
 111-152) to provide that assistance, the legislature shall:
 (1)  by law prescribe appropriate rate reductions for
 taxes imposed by hospital districts and counties in this state that
 reflect the reduction of health care costs of those districts and
 counties resulting from the receipt of additional federal funds for
 providing that assistance; and
 (2)  reduce the amount of money appropriated for
 providing uncompensated care to residents of this state to reflect
 the reduced need for that care.
 SECTION 2.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2013.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment requiring the
 reduction of amounts paid by Texans to provide health care to the
 uninsured if Medicaid eligibility is expanded in accordance with
 the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act; requiring
 hospital district and county tax rate reductions."
 * * * * *