House | 07/29/2013 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 07/28/2013 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 07/12/2013 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 07/12/2013 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 07/11/2013 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 138 | |
House | 07/11/2013 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 07/11/2013 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 07/11/2013 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 07/10/2013 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 66 | |
House | 07/10/2013 | Read first time | Journal Page: 66 | |
House | 07/09/2013 | Filed |