Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1015 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Canales (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 1015
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice provided to a court regarding certain defendants
 placed on state jail felony community supervision.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 15(f), Article 42.12, Code of Criminal
 Procedure, is amended by adding Subdivision (2-a) to read as
 follows:
 (2-a)  Not later than the 60th day after the date a
 defendant is received into the custody of a state jail felony
 facility, the Texas Department of Criminal Justice shall notify the
 sentencing court of the date on which the defendant will have served
 75 days in the facility. The notice must be provided by e-mail or
 other electronic communication.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 15(f), Article 42.12, Code of Criminal Procedure, applies only to a
 defendant who receives a sentence of confinement in a state jail on
 or after the effective date of this Act. A defendant who receives a
 sentence of confinement in a state jail before the effective date of
 this Act is governed by the law in effect at the time of sentencing,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *