E
|
06/19/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2015
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6049
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5564
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4971
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1388
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 958
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1707
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#233
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1599
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1590
|
House
|
04/16/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1366
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 488
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 488
|
House
|
01/29/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|