1 | | - | By: White of Tyler, Israel (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 104 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business |
---|
4 | | - | and Commerce; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following |
---|
5 | | - | vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | | - | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 104 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology at certain |
---|
12 | 6 | | events. |
---|
13 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Section 1601.455(b), Occupations Code, is |
---|
15 | 9 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 10 | | (b) A person holding a license, certificate, or permit under |
---|
17 | 11 | | this chapter may perform a service within the scope of the license, |
---|
18 | 12 | | certificate, or permit at a location other than a licensed facility |
---|
19 | 13 | | for a client: |
---|
20 | 14 | | (1) who, because of illness or physical or mental |
---|
21 | 15 | | incapacitation, is unable to receive the services at a licensed |
---|
22 | 16 | | facility; or |
---|
23 | 17 | | (2) in preparation for and at the location of a special |
---|
24 | 18 | | event, including a wedding. |
---|
25 | 19 | | SECTION 2. Section 1602.407(b), Occupations Code, is |
---|
26 | 20 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
27 | 21 | | (b) A person holding a license, certificate, or permit under |
---|
28 | 22 | | this chapter may perform a service within the scope of the license, |
---|
29 | 23 | | certificate, or permit at a location other than a licensed facility |
---|
30 | 24 | | for a client: |
---|
31 | 25 | | (1) who, because of illness or physical or mental |
---|
32 | 26 | | incapacitation, is unable to receive the services at a licensed |
---|
33 | 27 | | facility; or |
---|
34 | 28 | | (2) in preparation for and at the location of a special |
---|
35 | 29 | | event, including a wedding. |
---|
36 | 30 | | SECTION 3. Not later than December 1, 2015, the Texas |
---|
37 | 31 | | Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules to |
---|
38 | 32 | | implement Sections 1601.455(b) and 1602.407(b), Occupations Code, |
---|
39 | 33 | | as amended by this Act. |
---|
40 | 34 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
41 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 35 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 36 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 37 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 104 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 38 | + | 16, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 39 | + | voting. |
---|
| 40 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 41 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 42 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 104 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 43 | + | 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 44 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 45 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 46 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 47 | + | Date |
---|
| 48 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 49 | + | Governor |
---|