Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB104 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: White of Tyler, Israel (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 104
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Business
 and Commerce; May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the practice of barbering and cosmetology at certain
 events.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1601.455(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A person holding a license, certificate, or permit under
 this chapter may perform a service within the scope of the license,
 certificate, or permit at a location other than a licensed facility
 for a client:
 (1)  who, because of illness or physical or mental
 incapacitation, is unable to receive the services at a licensed
 facility; or
 (2)  in preparation for and at the location of a special
 event, including a wedding.
 SECTION 2.  Section 1602.407(b), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  A person holding a license, certificate, or permit under
 this chapter may perform a service within the scope of the license,
 certificate, or permit at a location other than a licensed facility
 for a client:
 (1)  who, because of illness or physical or mental
 incapacitation, is unable to receive the services at a licensed
 facility; or
 (2)  in preparation for and at the location of a special
 event, including a wedding.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than December 1, 2015, the Texas
 Commission of Licensing and Regulation shall adopt rules to
 implement Sections 1601.455(b) and 1602.407(b), Occupations Code,
 as amended by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *