Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1044 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Fallon, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 1044
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 19, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 19, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a segment of Farm-to-Market Road 423
 in Denton County as the U.S. Army Sergeant Enrique Mondragon
 Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.103 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.103.  U.S. ARMY SERGEANT ENRIQUE MONDRAGON MEMORIAL
 HIGHWAY. (a) The portion of Farm-to-Market Road 423 in Denton
 County between its intersection with U.S. Highway 380 and State
 Highway 121 is designated as the U.S. Army Sergeant Enrique
 Mondragon Memorial Highway. The designation is in addition to any
 other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the U.S. Army Sergeant Enrique Mondragon Memorial
 Highway and any other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *