Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1049 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez of Travis, Koop H.B. No. 1049
 (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 April 28, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 20, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 20, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the classification of licensed massage therapy programs
 as postsecondary education programs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 455.203, Occupations Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (e) and (f) to read as follows:
 (e)  The course of instruction in massage therapy provided by
 a licensed massage school is a postsecondary education program.
 (f)  A massage school that provides instruction to persons
 beyond the age of compulsory education is authorized to operate
 educational programs in massage therapy at the postsecondary level.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act to Section
 455.203, Occupations Code, does not confer any new or additional
 regulatory authority on the Department of State Health Services or
 prescribe any new or additional requirements for massage schools
 licensed under Chapter 455, Occupations Code.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *