Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1052 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1052
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 13, 2015, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 13, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating September as Hydrocephalus Awareness
 Month.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 662.106(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  September [October] is Hydrocephalus Awareness Month
 to:
 (1)  increase public awareness of hydrocephalus, a
 serious neurological condition characterized by the abnormal
 buildup of cerebrospinal fluids in the ventricles of the brain; and
 (2)  encourage the development of partnerships between
 the federal government, health care professionals, and patient
 advocacy groups to advance the public's understanding of the
 condition, improve the diagnosis and treatment of the condition,
 and support research for a cure.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *