Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1061 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Turner of Tarrant, et al. H.B. No. 1061
 (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prosecution of the offense of interference with
 public duties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 38.15, Penal Code, is amended by adding
 Subsections (d-1) and (d-2) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  Except as provided by Subsection (d-2), in a
 prosecution for an offense under Subsection (a)(1), there is a
 rebuttable presumption that the actor interferes with a peace
 officer if it is shown on the trial of the offense that the actor
 intentionally disseminated the home address, home telephone
 number, emergency contact information, or social security number of
 the officer or a family member of the officer or any other
 information that is specifically described by Section 552.117(a),
 Government Code.
 (d-2)  The presumption in Subsection (d-1) does not apply to
 information disseminated by:
 (1)  a radio or television station that holds a license
 issued by the Federal Communications Commission; or
 (2)  a newspaper that is:
 (A)  a free newspaper of general circulation or
 qualified to publish legal notices;
 (B)  published at least once a week; and
 (C)  available and of interest to the general
 public.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. For
 purposes of this section, an offense was committed before the
 effective date of this Act if any element of the offense occurred
 before that date.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *