E
|
06/17/2015
|
Effective on 9/1/15
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/27/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5213
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2559
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4807
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4984
|
House
|
05/25/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4571
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#645
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2578
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2526
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2526
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2063
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 490
|
House
|
02/02/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|