Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1077 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Campbell) H.B. No. 1077
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 April 23, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Business and Commerce; May 7, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 7, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the membership of the Electrical Safety and Licensing
 Advisory Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1305.051(a), Occupations Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The advisory board consists of nine members appointed by
 the presiding officer of the commission with the approval of the
 commission as follows:
 (1)  three master electrician members;
 (2)  three journeyman electrician members; [and]
 (3)  one master sign electrician member; and
 (4)  two [three] public members.
 SECTION 2.  The changes in law made by this Act to Section
 1305.051(a), Occupations Code, regarding the qualifications for a
 member of the Electrical Safety and Licensing Advisory Board do not
 affect the entitlement of a member serving on the board immediately
 before the effective date of this Act to continue to serve and
 function as a member of the board for the remainder of the member's
 term. When board vacancies occur on or after the effective date of
 this Act, the presiding officer of the Texas Commission of
 Licensing and Regulation shall appoint new members to the board in a
 manner that reflects the changes in law made by this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *