Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1723
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1500
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1460
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2895
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#806
|
Journal Page: 2894
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2894
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2888
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#743
|
Journal Page: 2776
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2776
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-E. Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 2775
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2775
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 41 and Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 2770
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2770
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/7/15 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2731
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2731
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2731
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1581
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Referred to Elections
|
|
Journal Page: 492
|
House
|
03/02/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 492
|
House
|
02/03/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|