Senate | 05/25/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/24/2015 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2023 | |
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Tagged | ||
Senate | 05/22/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1433 | |
Senate | 05/07/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1396 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2811 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2592 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Record vote | RV#660 | Journal Page: 2592 |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2592 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2592 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2540 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Amended | 1-P. King | Journal Page: 2539 |
House | 05/05/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2539 | |
House | 05/05/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/01/2015 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2015 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/19/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/02/2015 | Referred to State & Federal Power & Responsibility, Select | Journal Page: 493 | |
House | 03/02/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 493 | |
House | 02/03/2015 | Filed |