Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1114 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Gonzales (Senate Sponsor - Bettencourt) H.B. No. 1114
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 11, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority with whom certain political committees
 must file reports of political contributions and expenditures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 254.130, Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 254.130.  AUTHORITY WITH WHOM REPORTS FILED.  (a)
 Except as provided by Subsection (b), reports [Reports] filed under
 this subchapter shall be filed with the authority with whom the
 political committee's campaign treasurer appointment is required
 to be filed.
 (b)  A specific-purpose committee created to support or
 oppose a measure on the issuance of bonds by a school district shall
 file reports under this subchapter with the commission.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to a report of political
 contributions or expenditures due on or after the effective date of
 this Act.  A report of political contributions or expenditures due
 before the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in
 effect on the date the report is due, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *