1 | | - | By: Kacal (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1146 |
---|
2 | | - | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015; |
---|
3 | | - | May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | | - | Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported |
---|
5 | | - | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent |
---|
6 | | - | to printer.) |
---|
| 1 | + | H.B. No. 1146 |
---|
10 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
11 | 5 | | relating to persons who may operate a public water supply system. |
---|
12 | 6 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 7 | | SECTION 1. Section 341.033, Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
14 | 8 | | amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 9 | | (a-1) The licensed operator of a water supply system may be |
---|
16 | 10 | | a volunteer. The owner or manager of a water supply system that is |
---|
17 | 11 | | operated by a volunteer shall maintain a record of each volunteer |
---|
18 | 12 | | operator showing the name of the volunteer, contact information for |
---|
19 | 13 | | the volunteer, and the time period for which the volunteer is |
---|
20 | 14 | | responsible for operating the water supply system. |
---|
21 | 15 | | SECTION 2. Section 341.034(a), Health and Safety Code, is |
---|
22 | 16 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
23 | 17 | | (a) A person who operates a public water supply on a |
---|
24 | 18 | | contract or volunteer basis must hold a registration issued by the |
---|
25 | 19 | | commission under Chapter 37, Water Code. |
---|
26 | 20 | | SECTION 3. The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality |
---|
27 | 21 | | shall adopt rules necessary to implement Sections 341.033 and |
---|
28 | 22 | | 341.034, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later |
---|
29 | 23 | | than December 1, 2015. |
---|
30 | 24 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015. |
---|
31 | | - | * * * * * |
---|
| 25 | + | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
| 26 | + | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
| 27 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1146 was passed by the House on April |
---|
| 28 | + | 16, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
| 29 | + | voting. |
---|
| 30 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 31 | + | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
| 32 | + | I certify that H.B. No. 1146 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
| 33 | + | 20, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
| 34 | + | ______________________________ |
---|
| 35 | + | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
| 36 | + | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
| 37 | + | Date |
---|
| 38 | + | _____________________ |
---|
| 39 | + | Governor |
---|