Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1146 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kacal (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 1146
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to persons who may operate a public water supply system.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 341.033, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (a-1) to read as follows:
 (a-1)  The licensed operator of a water supply system may be
 a volunteer. The owner or manager of a water supply system that is
 operated by a volunteer shall maintain a record of each volunteer
 operator showing the name of the volunteer, contact information for
 the volunteer, and the time period for which the volunteer is
 responsible for operating the water supply system.
 SECTION 2.  Section 341.034(a), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who operates a public water supply on a
 contract or volunteer basis must hold a registration issued by the
 commission under Chapter 37, Water Code.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality
 shall adopt rules necessary to implement Sections 341.033 and
 341.034, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act, not later
 than December 1, 2015.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *