E | 05/28/2015 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/28/2015 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5571 | |
E | 05/20/2015 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4088 | |
Senate | 05/19/2015 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1715 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3785 | |
House | 05/18/2015 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 3846 | |
House | 05/15/2015 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3571 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1618 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1618 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1618 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1618 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1618 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1618 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 1618 | |
Senate | 05/15/2015 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/08/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1445 | |
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/06/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/05/2015 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1339 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/21/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1007 | |
Senate | 04/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 762 | |
House | 04/10/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Record vote | RV#181 | Journal Page: 1448 |
House | 04/09/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1448 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1442 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1442 | |
House | 04/09/2015 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2015 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 549 | |
House | 02/25/2015 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/25/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/09/2015 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 246 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 246 | |
House | 11/10/2014 | Filed |