Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB115 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Dale, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Fraser) H.B. No. 115
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House April 13, 2015;
3- April 21, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
4- Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 8, 2015, reported
5- favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 8, 2015, sent
6- to printer.)
1+H.B. No. 115
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to the criteria for awarding the Texas Purple Heart Medal
126 to members of the armed forces wounded or killed at Fort Hood on
137 November 5, 2009.
148 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
159 SECTION 1. Section 437.355(a), Government Code, is amended
1610 to read as follows:
1711 (a) The governor or adjutant general, if delegated the
1812 authority, may adopt policies and regulations relating to awarding:
1913 (1) the Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be
2014 awarded to a service member who:
2115 (A) [,] after September 11, 2001:
2216 (i) [(A)] was inducted into federal service
2317 from the Texas National Guard; and
2418 (ii) [(B)] meets the criteria for an award
2519 of the federal Purple Heart Medal; or
2620 (B) was wounded or killed at Fort Hood on
2721 November 5, 2009;
2822 (2) the Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
2923 awarded to:
3024 (A) a service member of the Texas military forces
3125 who has:
3226 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
3327 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
3428 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
3529 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
3630 demanding responsibility; or
3731 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
3832 service to the Texas military forces;
3933 (3) the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal, which
4034 shall be awarded to a member of the military forces of this state,
4135 another state, or the United States for exceptionally outstanding
4236 achievement or service to this state in performance of a duty of
4337 great responsibility while serving with the Texas military forces
4438 for whom the department receives a letter of recommendation for
4539 award of the Lone Star Distinguished Service Medal that:
4640 (A) gives an account of the exceptional
4741 achievement or service; and
4842 (B) includes facts and photographs, and extracts
4943 from official documents to support and amplify the facts;
5044 (4) the Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which shall
5145 be awarded to a service member of the military forces of this state,
5246 another state, or the United States who has performed service in a
5347 superior and clearly outstanding manner;
5448 (5) the Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall
5549 be awarded to a service member who:
5650 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
5751 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
5852 (B) is a member of the Texas military forces; and
5953 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
6054 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32, United
6155 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
6256 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
6357 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
6458 (6) the Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, which
6559 shall be awarded to a service member of the Texas military forces
6660 who served:
6761 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
6862 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
6963 state authority in accordance with Title 32, United States Code;
7064 and
7165 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
7266 mission in the state under civilian authority;
7367 (7) the Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded
7468 to a service member who was inducted into federal service from the
7569 Texas military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, 1946, or
7670 after June 1, 1950, if the service was for more than 90 days;
7771 (8) the Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
7872 awarded to a service member of the Texas National Guard who served,
7973 after September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by
8074 the United States secretary of defense;
8175 (9) the Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
8276 awarded to a member of the Texas military forces who has completed
8377 five years of honorable service during which the service member has
8478 shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
8579 this state;
8680 (10) the Texas Medal of Merit, which shall be awarded
8781 to a member of the military forces of this state, another state, or
8882 the United States who performs outstanding service or attains
8983 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
9084 (11) the Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall
9185 be awarded to a service member who completes three consecutive
9286 years of honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the
9387 service member has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and
9488 great loyalty to this state;
9589 (12) the Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign
9690 Medal, which shall be awarded to a service member who was inducted
9791 into federal service from the Texas National Guard after August 1,
9892 1990, in support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert
9993 Storm, without regard to the place that the service member was
10094 deployed while serving on active federal military duty;
10195 (13) the Texas Iraqi Campaign Medal, which shall be
10296 awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
10397 from the Texas National Guard, without regard to the place that the
10498 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
10599 military duty, after:
106100 (A) March 19, 2003, in support of Operation Iraqi
107101 Freedom; or
108102 (B) August 31, 2010, in support of Operation New
109103 Dawn; and
110104 (14) the Texas Afghanistan Campaign Medal, which shall
111105 be awarded to a service member who was inducted into federal service
112106 from the Texas National Guard after October 6, 2001, in support of
113107 Operation Enduring Freedom, without regard to the place that the
114108 service member was deployed while serving on active federal
115109 military duty.
116110 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
117111 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
118112 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
119113 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
120114 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
121- * * * * *
115+ ______________________________ ______________________________
116+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
117+ I certify that H.B. No. 115 was passed by the House on April
118+ 9, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not
119+ voting.
120+ ______________________________
121+ Chief Clerk of the House
122+ I certify that H.B. No. 115 was passed by the Senate on May
123+ 15, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
124+ ______________________________
125+ Secretary of the Senate
126+ APPROVED: _____________________
127+ Date
128+ _____________________
129+ Governor