Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1843
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Referred to Vet Affairs & Military Installations
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/15/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1623
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1550
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3405
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#950
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/12/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3167
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3076
|
House
|
05/09/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2680
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2015
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 274
|
House
|
02/11/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 274
|
House
|
11/10/2014
|
Filed
|
|
|