Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1190 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1190
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 21, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 21, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the compensation of property owners whose property is
 damaged as a result of a pursuit involving a federal law enforcement
 agency.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 683.015(f), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  A law enforcement agency or an attorney representing the
 state may use funds transferred under Subsection (d) to compensate
 property owners whose property was damaged as a result of a pursuit
 involving a law enforcement agency or a federal law enforcement
 agency, regardless of whether the agency would be liable under
 Chapter 101, Civil Practice and Remedies Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to property damage occurring on or after the effective date of this
 Act. Property damage occurring before the effective date of this
 Act is governed by the law in effect at the time the damage
 occurred, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *