Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB120 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Flynn (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 120
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2015;
 May 6, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Finance;
 May 12, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 10,
 Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the purchase of food and beverages by the Texas Division
 of Emergency Management for certain division personnel.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 418.052 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.052.  USE OF FUNDS TO SUPPORT CERTAIN DIVISION
 PERSONNEL. The division may use appropriated funds to purchase
 food and beverages for division personnel who are:
 (1)  activated to provide services in response to a
 disaster; and
 (2)  unable to leave or required to remain at their
 assignment areas due to the disaster.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *