Senate | 05/12/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/12/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1535 | |
Senate | 05/11/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1460 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2966 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2711 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Record vote | RV#715 | Journal Page: 2710 |
House | 05/07/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 2710 | |
House | 05/07/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2710 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2642 | |
House | 05/06/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/09/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1472 | |
House | 04/02/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/02/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 521 | |
House | 02/09/2015 | Filed |