Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1232 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Lucio III (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1232
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 7, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture, Water, and Rural Affairs; May 12, 2015, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 12, 2015, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a study by the Texas Water Development Board of the
 hydrology and geology of the confined and unconfined aquifers in
 this state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a) The Texas Water Development Board shall
 conduct a study of the hydrology and geology of the confined and
 unconfined aquifers in this state to determine:
 (1)  the quality and quantity of groundwater in those
 aquifers, specifically regarding the salinity of those aquifers;
 (2)  whether those aquifers are tributary or
 non-tributary;
 (3)  the contribution of those aquifers to any surface
 flow of any water in this state; and
 (4)  the contribution of those aquifers to any other
 aquifer in this state.
 (b)  In conducting the study, the board shall produce:
 (1)  a map that identifies the area and water quality of
 the confined and unconfined aquifers in this state;
 (2)  a map that identifies which aquifers are tributary
 and which are non-tributary; and
 (3)  a report on the contribution of those aquifers to
 any other aquifer in this state.
 (c)  Before conducting the study, the board shall determine
 the minimum rate at which an aquifer must contribute to another
 aquifer in this state or to the surface flow of any water in this
 state in order to be included in the study.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than December 31, 2016, the Texas Water
 Development Board shall report the results of the study conducted
 under this Act to the lieutenant governor, the speaker of the house
 of representatives, and the standing committees of the senate and
 the house of representatives that have jurisdiction over natural
 resources.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *