House | 04/07/2015 | No action taken in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/07/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/31/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Withdrawn from schedule | ||
House | 03/10/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/03/2015 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 03/03/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 524 | |
House | 02/10/2015 | Filed |