Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1297
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1255
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2343
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#459
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2161
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#444
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2097
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Amended
|
2-Stickland
|
Journal Page: 2095
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2094
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1340
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 524
|
House
|
03/03/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 524
|
House
|
02/10/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|