Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1289 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Giddings (Senate Sponsor - West) H.B. No. 1289
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the acquisition and sale of unimproved real property by
 an urban land bank.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 379C.004(a), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The governing body of a municipality may adopt an urban
 land bank demonstration program in which the officer charged with
 selling real property ordered sold pursuant to foreclosure of a tax
 lien may sell certain eligible real property by private sale for
 [purposes of] affordable housing development or other purposes as
 provided by this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 379C.014(a) and (c), Local Government
 Code, as added by Chapter 1037 (H.B. 2840), Acts of the 83rd
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2013, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  Notwithstanding the other provisions of this chapter,
 the land bank may acquire and sell to a developer property intended
 for commercial use [to a developer to allow the construction of a
 grocery store that has at least 6,000 square feet of enclosed space
 and that offers for sale fresh produce and other food items for home
 consumption].
 (c)  A sale under this section within the four-year period
 following the date of acquisition of the property by the land bank
 is for a public purpose and satisfies the requirement under Section
 379C.009(b) that the property be sold within the four-year [that]
 period to a qualified participating developer.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *