Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1307 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Springer (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 1307
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2015;
 May 5, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 25, 2015, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 LucioX
 BettencourtX
 CampbellX
 GarciaX
 MenéndezX
 NicholsX
 TaylorofGalvestonX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority of the board of directors of certain
 hospital districts to take certain actions.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1077.106, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection
 (c) to read as follows:
 (b)  The district may:
 (1)  purchase, construct, acquire, repair, or renovate
 buildings and improvements; [and]
 (2)  mortgage or pledge the buildings and improvements
 as security for the payment of the purchase price, subject to
 Subsection (c); and
 (3)  equip buildings and improvements for hospital
 purposes.
 (c)  The total amount of debt secured by the district's
 buildings and improvements may not exceed $2.5 million.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 1081.056 and 1081.057, Special District
 Local Laws Code, are amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 1081.056.  QUORUM. Any four [five] directors
 constitute a quorum.
 Sec. 1081.057.  VOTING REQUIREMENT. A concurrence of four
 [five] directors is sufficient in any matter relating to district
 business.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *