Senate | 05/13/2015 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1576 | |
Senate | 05/13/2015 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1551 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3405 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3158 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Record vote | RV#938 | Journal Page: 3157 |
House | 05/12/2015 | Passed | Journal Page: 3157 | |
House | 05/12/2015 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3157 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3054 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Record vote | RV#890 | Journal Page: 3054 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3054 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3054 | |
House | 05/11/2015 | Amended | 1-Button | Journal Page: 3053 |
House | 05/11/2015 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3053 | |
House | 05/08/2015 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2015 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2015 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2015 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2451 | |
House | 04/23/2015 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/23/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2015 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/05/2015 | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development | Journal Page: 575 | |
House | 03/05/2015 | Read first time | Journal Page: 575 | |
House | 02/11/2015 | Filed |