Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1337 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1337
2- (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
3- May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
4- and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
5- following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
6-Click here to see the committee vote
1+H.B. No. 1337
72
83
9- A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
104 AN ACT
115 relating to requiring institutions and assisted living facilities
126 to maintain guardianship orders of residents.
137 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
148 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
159 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.019 to read as follows:
1610 Sec. 242.019. GUARDIANSHIP ORDERS. An institution shall
1711 make a reasonable effort to request a copy of any court order
1812 appointing a guardian of a resident or a resident's estate from the
1913 resident's nearest relative or the person responsible for the
2014 resident's support. An institution that receives a copy of a court
2115 order appointing a guardian of a resident or a resident's estate
2216 shall maintain a copy of the court order in the resident's medical
2317 records.
2418 SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 247, Health and Safety
2519 Code, is amended by adding Section 247.070 to read as follows:
2620 Sec. 247.070. GUARDIANSHIP ORDERS. An assisted living
2721 facility shall make a reasonable effort to request a copy of any
2822 court order appointing a guardian of a resident or a resident's
2923 estate from the resident's nearest relative or the person
3024 responsible for the resident's support. An assisted living facility
3125 that receives a copy of a court order appointing a guardian of a
3226 resident or a resident's estate shall maintain a copy of the court
3327 order in the resident's medical records.
3428 SECTION 3. Section 260A.007(e), Health and Safety Code, is
3529 amended to read as follows:
3630 (e) In investigating the report of abuse, neglect,
3731 exploitation, or other complaint, the investigator for the
3832 department shall:
3933 (1) make an unannounced visit to the facility to
4034 determine the nature and cause of the alleged abuse, neglect, or
4135 exploitation of the resident;
4236 (2) interview each available witness, including the
4337 resident who suffered the alleged abuse, neglect, or exploitation
4438 if the resident is able to communicate or another resident or other
4539 witness identified by any source as having personal knowledge
4640 relevant to the report of abuse, neglect, exploitation, or other
4741 complaint;
4842 (3) personally inspect any physical circumstance that
4943 is relevant and material to the report of abuse, neglect,
5044 exploitation, or other complaint and that may be objectively
5145 observed;
5246 (4) make a photographic record of any injury to a
5347 resident, subject to Subsection (n); [and]
5448 (5) write an investigation report that includes:
5549 (A) the investigator's personal observations;
5650 (B) a review of relevant documents and records;
5751 (C) a summary of each witness statement,
5852 including the statement of the resident that suffered the alleged
5953 abuse, neglect, or exploitation and any other resident interviewed
6054 in the investigation; and
6155 (D) a statement of the factual basis for the
6256 findings for each incident or problem alleged in the report or other
6357 allegation; and
6458 (6) for a resident of an institution or assisted
6559 living facility, inspect any court order appointing a guardian of
6660 the resident who was the subject of the alleged abuse, neglect, or
6761 exploitation that is maintained in the resident's medical records
6862 under Section 242.019 or 247.070.
6963 SECTION 4. (a) An institution is not required to comply
7064 with Section 242.019, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act,
7165 before January 1, 2016.
7266 (b) An assisted living facility is not required to comply
7367 with Section 247.070, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act,
7468 before January 1, 2016.
7569 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
76- * * * * *
70+ ______________________________ ______________________________
71+ President of the Senate Speaker of the House
72+ I certify that H.B. No. 1337 was passed by the House on May 5,
73+ 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 1, 2 present, not
74+ voting.
75+ ______________________________
76+ Chief Clerk of the House
77+ I certify that H.B. No. 1337 was passed by the Senate on May
78+ 26, 2015, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
79+ ______________________________
80+ Secretary of the Senate
81+ APPROVED: _____________________
82+ Date
83+ _____________________
84+ Governor