Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1337 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1337
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2015;
 May 7, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 22, 2015, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to requiring institutions and assisted living facilities
 to maintain guardianship orders of residents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 242, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 242.019 to read as follows:
 Sec. 242.019.  GUARDIANSHIP ORDERS. An institution shall
 make a reasonable effort to request a copy of any court order
 appointing a guardian of a resident or a resident's estate from the
 resident's nearest relative or the person responsible for the
 resident's support. An institution that receives a copy of a court
 order appointing a guardian of a resident or a resident's estate
 shall maintain a copy of the court order in the resident's medical
 records.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 247, Health and Safety
 Code, is amended by adding Section 247.070 to read as follows:
 Sec. 247.070.  GUARDIANSHIP ORDERS. An assisted living
 facility shall make a reasonable effort to request a copy of any
 court order appointing a guardian of a resident or a resident's
 estate from the resident's nearest relative or the person
 responsible for the resident's support. An assisted living facility
 that receives a copy of a court order appointing a guardian of a
 resident or a resident's estate shall maintain a copy of the court
 order in the resident's medical records.
 SECTION 3.  Section 260A.007(e), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  In investigating the report of abuse, neglect,
 exploitation, or other complaint, the investigator for the
 department shall:
 (1)  make an unannounced visit to the facility to
 determine the nature and cause of the alleged abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation of the resident;
 (2)  interview each available witness, including the
 resident who suffered the alleged abuse, neglect, or exploitation
 if the resident is able to communicate or another resident or other
 witness identified by any source as having personal knowledge
 relevant to the report of abuse, neglect, exploitation, or other
 complaint;
 (3)  personally inspect any physical circumstance that
 is relevant and material to the report of abuse, neglect,
 exploitation, or other complaint and that may be objectively
 observed;
 (4)  make a photographic record of any injury to a
 resident, subject to Subsection (n); [and]
 (5)  write an investigation report that includes:
 (A)  the investigator's personal observations;
 (B)  a review of relevant documents and records;
 (C)  a summary of each witness statement,
 including the statement of the resident that suffered the alleged
 abuse, neglect, or exploitation and any other resident interviewed
 in the investigation; and
 (D)  a statement of the factual basis for the
 findings for each incident or problem alleged in the report or other
 allegation; and
 (6)  for a resident of an institution or assisted
 living facility, inspect any court order appointing a guardian of
 the resident who was the subject of the alleged abuse, neglect, or
 exploitation that is maintained in the resident's medical records
 under Section 242.019 or 247.070.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  An institution is not required to comply
 with Section 242.019, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act,
 before January 1, 2016.
 (b)  An assisted living facility is not required to comply
 with Section 247.070, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act,
 before January 1, 2016.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *