E
|
06/20/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/30/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6025
|
Senate
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
House
|
05/30/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5692
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5697
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2852
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5057
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#1629
|
Journal Page: 5058
|
House
|
05/28/2015
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5057
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4757
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2130
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Whitmire
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2129
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1945
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1846
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1842
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1433
|
Senate
|
05/07/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1396
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2811
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#653
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2585
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2536
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2536
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Johnson
|
Journal Page: 2533
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2533
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2111
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2015
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|