LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB1363
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB1363
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1363
Compare Versions
HB1363 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1363 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1363 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB1363 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB1363 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB1363 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
HB1363 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB1363 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1363 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB1363 Enrolled May 29, 2015
HB1363 Comm Sub May 22, 2015
HB1363 Engrossed May 6, 2015
HB1363 Comm Sub April 28, 2015
HB1363 Introduced February 12, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare