E
|
06/01/2015
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2015
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6050
|
E
|
05/22/2015
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4344
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1897
|
House
|
05/22/2015
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4214
|
House
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4218
|
House
|
05/20/2015
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3902
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 1728
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 1585
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1542
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1389
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1344
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2676
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#592
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2481
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2460
|
House
|
05/05/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
House
|
04/30/2015
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2015
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1784
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 1435
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Referred to Special Purpose Districts
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
House
|
03/09/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 588
|
House
|
02/16/2015
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|