Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1376 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Eltife) H.B. No. 1376
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 20, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 25, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 25, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the application of certain concealed handgun license
 laws to community supervision and corrections department officers
 and juvenile probation officers; reducing a fee.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 411.1882(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who is serving in this state as a judge or
 justice of a federal court, as an active judicial officer[,] as
 defined by Section 411.201, [or] as a district attorney, assistant
 district attorney, criminal district attorney, assistant criminal
 district attorney, county attorney, or assistant county attorney,
 as a supervision officer as defined by Section 2, Article 42.12,
 Code of Criminal Procedure, or as a juvenile probation officer may
 establish handgun proficiency for the purposes of this subchapter
 by obtaining from a handgun proficiency instructor approved by the
 Texas Commission on Law Enforcement for purposes of Section
 1702.1675, Occupations Code, a sworn statement that indicates that
 the person, during the 12-month period preceding the date of the
 person's application to the department, demonstrated to the
 instructor proficiency in the use of handguns.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter H, Chapter 411, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 411.1953 to read as follows:
 Sec. 411.1953.  REDUCTION OF FEES FOR COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
 AND CORRECTIONS DEPARTMENT OFFICERS AND JUVENILE PROBATION
 OFFICERS. Notwithstanding any other provision of this subchapter,
 an applicant who is serving in this state as a supervision officer,
 as defined by Section 2, Article 42.12, Code of Criminal Procedure,
 or as a juvenile probation officer shall pay a fee of $25 for the
 issuance of an original or renewed license under this subchapter.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a concealed handgun license issued or renewed on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A concealed handgun license issued or
 renewed before the effective date of this Act is covered by the law
 in effect on the date the license was issued or renewed, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *