Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
Senate
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3138
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5228
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5228
|
House
|
05/29/2015
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5228
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2015
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2015
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4756
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2141
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/25/2015
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2134
|
Senate
|
05/24/2015
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2015
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1849
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1717
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1535
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1458
|
House
|
05/11/2015
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3267
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2888
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#805
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
House
|
05/08/2015
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2887
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2769
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Record vote
|
RV#739
|
Journal Page: 2768
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2768
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Amended
|
1-Morrison
|
Journal Page: 2766
|
House
|
05/07/2015
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2766
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Postponed
|
5/7/15 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2642
|
House
|
05/06/2015
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2015
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2015
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2015
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2015
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2004
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2015
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
House
|
03/16/2015
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 714
|
House
|
03/13/2015
|
Filed
|
|
|