LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2015 - 84th Regular
House
Bills
HB14
Compare Versions
TX
Texas House Bill HB14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2015 - 84th Regular
Texas House Bill HB14
Compare Versions
HB14 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB14 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB14 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB14 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB14 Comm Sub April 26, 2015
HB14 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
HB14 Senate Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB14 House Committee Report February 2, 2025
HB14 Comm Sub May 21, 2015
HB14 Engrossed May 11, 2015
HB14 Comm Sub April 26, 2015
HB14 Introduced March 13, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare