Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1404 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/13/2015

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            84R8079 MK-D
 By: Leach H.B. No. 1404


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a committee to evaluate special
 education services in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 29.022 to read as follows:
 Sec. 29.022.  SPECIAL EDUCATION SERVICES EVALUATION
 COMMITTEE. (a) A committee is established under this section to
 examine, review, and evaluate the provision of special education
 services by public school districts in the state.
 (b)  The commissioner, in collaboration with the lieutenant
 governor and the speaker of the house of representatives, shall
 appoint members of the committee. The committee shall be composed
 of:
 (1)  one member of the house of representatives;
 (2)  one member of the senate;
 (3)  one superintendent of a school district;
 (4)  one special education teacher;
 (5)  three parents of students who receive special
 education services from a school district;
 (6)  one physician who is a doctor of medicine; and
 (7)  one attorney who specializes in education law.
 (c)  The commissioner, in collaboration with the lieutenant
 governor and the speaker of the house of representatives, shall
 designate a member of the committee to serve as presiding officer.
 (d)  The commissioner, in collaboration with the lieutenant
 governor and the speaker of the house of representatives, shall
 appoint the members of the committee not later than November 1,
 2015.
 (e)  The presiding officer shall call the initial meeting of
 the committee on or before December 1, 2015. The committee shall
 meet at the times and places that the presiding officer determines
 are appropriate. The committee shall adopt rules necessary to
 fulfill the committee's duties under this section.
 (f)  Members of the committee serve without compensation.
 (g)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 committee.
 (h)  The committee shall:
 (1)  evaluate the compliance of each public school
 district with current laws and rules related to special education
 services; and
 (2)  review current laws and rules related to special
 education services in public schools and recommend changes or
 improvements to the laws or rules.
 (i)  Not later than November 1, 2016, the committee shall
 deliver a report to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of
 the house of representatives, and appropriate committees of the
 legislature that includes:
 (1)  a description of the activities of the committee;
 (2)  the findings and recommendations of the committee,
 including any proposed policy and research recommendations; and
 (3)  any proposals for legislation or other matters the
 committee considers appropriate.
 (j)  The committee is abolished and this section expires
 December 1, 2016.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.