Texas 2015 - 84th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1430 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: King of Taylor (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 1430
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2015;
 May 4, 2015, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 11, 2015, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 11, 2015, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of mental health in the public services
 endorsement on a public school diploma and in information about
 health science career pathways.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 28.02122 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.02122.  INCLUSION OF MENTAL HEALTH PROFESSIONS IN
 HEALTH SCIENCE CAREER INFORMATION. The agency shall ensure that
 any information provided to students relating to health science
 careers includes information regarding mental health professions.
 To the extent that the public services endorsement includes
 information on health science career pathways, the information must
 include mental health careers as a possible pathway.
 SECTION 2.  Section 28.025(c-1), Education Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c-1)  A student may earn an endorsement on the student's
 diploma and transcript by successfully completing curriculum
 requirements for that endorsement adopted by the State Board of
 Education by rule.  The State Board of Education by rule shall
 provide students with multiple options for earning each
 endorsement, including, to the greatest extent possible, coherent
 sequences of courses.  The State Board of Education by rule must
 permit a student to enroll in courses under more than one
 endorsement curriculum before the student's junior year.  An
 endorsement under this subsection may be earned in any of the
 following categories:
 (1)  science, technology, engineering, and mathematics
 (STEM), which includes courses directly related to science,
 including environmental science, technology, including computer
 science, engineering, and advanced mathematics;
 (2)  business and industry, which includes courses
 directly related to database management, information technology,
 communications, accounting, finance, marketing, graphic design,
 architecture, construction, welding, logistics, automotive
 technology, agricultural science, and heating, ventilation, and
 air conditioning;
 (3)  public services, which includes courses directly
 related to health sciences and occupations, mental health,
 education and training, law enforcement, and culinary arts and
 hospitality;
 (4)  arts and humanities, which includes courses
 directly related to political science, world languages, cultural
 studies, English literature, history, and fine arts; and
 (5)  multidisciplinary studies, which allows a student
 to:
 (A)  select courses from the curriculum of each
 endorsement area described by Subdivisions (1) through (4); and
 (B)  earn credits in a variety of advanced courses
 from multiple content areas sufficient to complete the
 distinguished level of achievement under the foundation high school
 program.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2015.
 * * * * *